IL HB1572 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In a provision concerning emergency powers, provides that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation has the power to issue licenses, including temporary licenses, to health care professionals on an expedited basis in accordance with the rules adopted by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for expedited licensure.
Title
DFPR-EXPEDITED LICENSE
Sponsors
Rep. William Hauter [R] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-06-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William E Hauter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1572&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1572.htm |