IL HB1745 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. In provisions concerning individual health plans that provide coverage for prescription drugs, provides that beginning January 1, 2023, health insurance carriers shall ensure that at least 10% of individual health care plans offered in each applicable service area apply a flat-dollar copayment structure to the entire drug benefit; and beginning January 1, 2024, health insurance carriers shall ensure that at least 25% of individual health care plans offered in each applicable service area apply a flat-dollar copayment structure to the entire drug benefit. In provisions concerning group health plans that provide coverage for prescription drugs, provides that beginning January 1, 2023, health insurance carriers shall offer at least one group health plan in each applicable service area that applies a flat-dollar copayment structure to the entire drug benefit; and beginning January 1, 2024, health insurance carriers shall offer at least 2 group health plans in each applicable service area that apply a flat-dollar copayment structure to the entire drug benefit. Provides that the flat-dollar copayment structure for prescription drugs must be applied pre-deductible and be reasonably graduated and proportionately related in all tier levels such that the copayment structure as a whole does not discriminate against or discourage the enrollment of individuals with significant health care needs. Requires the health insurance carriers to clearly and appropriately name the plans to aid in individual or group plan selection. Requires the health insurance carriers to market the plans in the same manner as their other plans. Requires the Department of Insurance to adopt rules necessary to implement and enforce the provisions. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
INS-PRESCRIPTION DRUG BENEFITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0391 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |