IL HB1775 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Incrementally increases the minimum retirement annuity for current and future retirees who have retired from service at age 50 or over with 20 or more years of service, up to $1,250 per month beginning on January 1, 2020. Also makes a technical change. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHGO FIRE-RETMT INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 6-128.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1775&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1775.htm |