IL HB1792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that the par value of shares of a credit union must be at least $1 (rather than $5). Provides that the board of credit union advisors shall meet at least once each calendar year (rather than once each 6 months). Provides that credit union members may vote on questions and in elections by secure electronic record if approved by the board of directors. Changes the definition of "compliance review committee". Changes the limit on the amount of loans a credit union may make to individual members and how those limitations are set. Provides that a credit union or network credit union may create and use descriptive and brand references to promote and market its identity, services, and products to its members. Provides that corporate bonds identified as investment grade by at least one nationally recognized statistical rating organization may be invested by the credit union with funds not used in loans provided that certain criteria are satisfied. Provides that credit unions may invest funds not used in loans to aid in the credit union's management of its assets, liabilities, and liquidity in the purchase of an investment interest in a pool of loans, in whole or in part and without regard to the membership of the borrowers, from other depository institutions and financial type institutions, including mortgage banks, finance companies, insurance companies, and other loan sellers. Provides that each divisional credit union may (rather than shall) have an advisory board of directors and the advisory board of directors may (rather than the board of directors shall) appoint a divisional credit union chief management official. Provides that a divisional credit union may determine to identify its advisory board as a committee and its divisional chief management official with a title it deems reasonable and appropriate. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT UNIONS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0361 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-023-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Re-assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 34.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 64.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |