IL HB1801 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0867
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0867
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the "Medicaid" Article.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0867 | |
2010-01-21 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-01-21 | Governor Approved | |
2009-11-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-10-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-10-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2009 | |
2009-10-28 | Second Reading | |
2009-10-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 28, 2009 | |
2009-10-28 | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-10-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2009 | |
2009-10-22 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-10-16 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-16 | First Reading | |
2009-10-16 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-10-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-10-16 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-10-15 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-10-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-15 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-10-15 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-10-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-10-14 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-14 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-14 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-14 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-10-14 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-10-13 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-13 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-10-13 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |