IL HB1807 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates an assessment freeze homestead exemption for persons receiving federal Supplemental Security Income. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY TAX-SSI FREEZE
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1807&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1807.htm |