IL HB1847 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, pretreated seeds shall not be used in the production of ethanol. Defines "pretreated seeds".
Title
EPA-PRETREATED SEED BAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-044-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-01-25 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-012-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |