IL HB1852 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that alcoholic liquors may be sold at retail in buildings of golf courses owned by Illinois State University in connection with the operation of an established food serving facility during times when food is dispensed for consumption upon the premises. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR - ISU GOLF COURSE
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0033 |
2011-06-28 | House | Effective Date June 28, 2011 |
2011-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-035-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-001-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |