IL HB1926 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0451 |
2011-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2011 |
2011-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-003-001 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-002 |
2011-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Re-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |