IL HB1926 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Repeals the Contagious Disease Hospitals In Cities Of 500,000 Or More Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Further amends the Illinois Municipal Code making a conforming change.
Title
MUNI TUBERCULOSIS SANITARIUMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0587 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-001 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Luft |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-25010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-29 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-4-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 920 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 920 | 5.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |