IL HB2093 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Extends the list of persons required to report child abuse or neglect to include any physician, physician's assistant, registered nurse, licensed practical nurse, medical technician, certified nursing assistant, social worker, licensed professional counselor, office personnel, or volunteer of any office, clinic, or any other physical location that provides abortions, abortion counseling, abortion referrals, contraceptives, contraceptive counseling, sex education, or gynecological care and services.
Title
DCFS-CHILD ABUSE-REQUIRED RPTS
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Rep. Darlene Senger [R] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0254 |
2011-08-04 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-04-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |