IL HB2145 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to buildings for school purposes, provides that referendum approval is required for all school construction projects begun on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, including, but not limited to, (i) projects with funding derived from the school district's bonded indebtedness or tax levy or any other taxes, revenues, or debt instruments, (ii) projects that involve a building being leased by the school district, (iii) projects with funding derived from the sale or disposition of other property, or (iv) projects with funding received from a grant, gift, or lease payment; defines "school construction project". Requires the referendum language to include a description of the project, the estimated total cost of the project, the source of funding for the project, and any other relevant financial information about the project, as currently required by statute. Removes provisions allowing no referendum approval for the certain purchase, construction, or building of a building. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCH BUILDING-REFERENDUM
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |