IL HB2238 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no policy of automobile insurance may be cancelled where the basis for such cancellation is the insured's lack of a valid drivers license or valid instruction permit if the insurer failed to ask the insured for proof of a valid drivers license or valid instruction permit at the time the insured applied for coverage.
Title
INS CD - UNLICENSED DRIVERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 023-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2238&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2238.htm |