IL HB2263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |