IL HB2263 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes changes concerning the adoption of rules by the State Board of Education governing time out and physical restraint in the public schools. Subject to appropriation, requires the State Board to create a grant program for school districts and special education cooperatives and charter schools to implement school-wide, culturally sensitive, and trauma-informed practices, positive behavioral interventions and supports, and restorative practices. Allows the State Board to contract with a third party to provide assistance with oversight and monitoring, and requires the State Board to establish reduction goals and a system of ongoing review, auditing, and monitoring. Makes changes in provisions concerning a school board's use of time out and physical restraint, including providing that isolated time out, time out, and physical restraint may be used only under certain circumstances, prohibiting the deprivation of necessities and prone, mechanical, and chemical restraint, and requiring a meeting with school personnel if requested by the parent or guardian, the provision of information to parents and guardians, and written procedures. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOLS-WORK ETHIC INSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-01-12 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-01-12 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-039-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 148 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |