IL HB2266 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0675
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. In provisions concerning the offense of unlawful visitation interference, changes the name of the offense to unlawful parenting time interference and changes references from "visitation" to "parenting time"; also adds references to "custody time". Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act to change a cross reference to the offense. Effective immediately.
Title
PATERNITY-DNA TEST REQUIRED
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Paul Froehlich [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. Eddie Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0675 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-20 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez | |
2009-05-14 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-03-05 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul D. Froehlich |