IL HB2272 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Limitations on Private Military Contractors Act. Requires training to be directly supervised by, and training personnel certified by, the Illinois State Law Enforcement Standards and Training Board or the Illinois State Police. Prohibits use as an armed force except under an emergency order of the Governor. Effective immediately.
Title
PRIVATE MILITARY CONTRACTORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2272&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2272.htm |