IL HB2355 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Sets forth a definition of "travel insurance". Makes a change in the provision concerning limited lines producer licenses. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, a travel retailer may offer and disseminate travel insurance on behalf of and under a limited lines producer business entity license only if certain conditions are met. Provides that any travel retailer offering or disseminating travel insurance shall make available to prospective purchasers brochures or other written materials that contain certain information and explanations. Prohibits a travel retailer's employee or authorized representative who is not licensed as an insurance producer from certain actions. Provides that a travel retailer whose insurance-related activities, and those of its employees and authorized representatives, are limited to offering and disseminating travel insurance on behalf of and under the direction of a limited lines producer meeting certain conditions is authorized to do so and receive related compensation, upon registration by the limited lines producer. Provides that travel insurance may be provided under an individual policy or under a group or master policy. Provides that as the insurer designee, the limited lines producer is responsible for the acts of the travel retailer and shall use reasonable means to ensure compliance by the travel retailer with the provision concerning travel insurance limited line license for limited lines travel insurance producers.
Title
INS CD-TRAVEL INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 026-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 500-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |