IL HB2404 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Credit for Prior Learning Act. Requires each public university to submit its policies and procedures for students to earn credit for prior learning to the Board of Higher Education for review and approval and each community college to submit its policies and procedures for students to earn credit for prior learning to the Illinois Community College Board for review and approval. Provides that, at a minimum, these procedures shall include a listing of the types of documentation acceptable and the dates of inclusion for which prior learning is acceptable. Requires the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board to adopt rules to permit public higher education institutions to award credit for prior learning after the assessment of prior learning experiences for documented learning that demonstrates achievement of all terminal objectives for a specific course or courses.
Title
CREDIT FOR PRIOR LEARNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0261 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Community College Access & Affordability Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |