IL HB2411 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the standard registration fee for passenger motor vehicles of the first division and motor vehicles of the second division weighing not more than 8,000 pounds shall be reduced by 50% for any Illinois vehicle owner who has served on active duty in the armed forces and was discharged or separated under honorable conditions and provided proof of service as required by the Secretary of State. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERAN REGISTRATION FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-806.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |