IL HB2426 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that new redevelopment project areas may not be established under the Act until 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Repeals the provisions 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF 2-YEAR MORATORIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2426&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2426.htm |