IL HB2437 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of any municipality may regulate and license landlords, as defined by the corporate authorities of the municipality, within that municipality. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-LANDLORD REGULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2437&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2437.htm |