IL HB2443 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board or board of county commissioners of a county may prohibit the sale of and the use of coal tar sealant product and high polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbon sealant product on any surface, except for highway structures, including, but not limited to, a driveway, parking area, playground, sidewalk, bike trail, or roadway within the county. Amends the Municipal Code making similar changes.
Title
COUNTY&MUNI-COAL TAR PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1061.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-30-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-80-24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2443&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2443.htm |