IL HB2447 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. Changes the definition of resident to mean a person who meets the residency requirements as defined in the provision of the Illinois Public Aid Code concerning residence (instead of an individual (i) who is in the State for other than a temporary or transitory purpose during the taxable year or (ii) who is domiciled in the State but is absent from the State for a temporary or transitory purpose during the taxable year).
Title
ALL KIDS - RESIDENT
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | To Public Benefits Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2447&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2447.htm |