IL HB2458 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-4)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the earned income tax credit to (i) 12% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2015 and ending prior to December 31, 2016, (ii) 14% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2016 and ending prior to December 31, 2017, (iii) 16% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2017 and ending prior to December 31, 2018, (iv) 18% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2018 and ending prior to December 31, 2019, and (v) 20% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EARNED INCOME CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2458&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2458.htm |