IL HB2473 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a board of trustees may enter into contracts for supplies, materials, or work involving an expenditure in excess of $20,000 through participation in a joint governmental or nongovernmental purchasing program that requires as part of its selection procedure a competitive solicitation and procurement process. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROTECTION DIST-CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0139 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 11k | Amended Code | Citation Text |