IL HB2476 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes persons subject to chemical or blood tests for the ingestion, consumption, or use of drugs liable for the cost of employing a medical professional to perform the test up to a maximum of $500 if the person is (1) found guilty of driving under the influence of alcohol or other drugs or a similar local ordinance, or (2) pleads guilty to or stipulates to facts supporting a conviction for reckless driving or aggravated reckless driving or a similar local ordinance when the person was originally charged with driving under the influence of alcohol or other drugs or a similar local ordinance. Allows reimbursement even if the person does not consent to the blood draw.
Title
BLOOD TEST REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2476&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2476.htm |