IL HB2503 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Adds language to provide that if a resident of a community college district wants to attend the community college maintained by the district of his or her residence, but the student wants to enroll in a program that is not offered by that community college and the community college does not have a contractual agreement for such a program, then the student may attend any recognized public community college in any other district and shall pay tuition and fees at the rate of the sending college. Sets forth provisions concerning financial assistance; a program directory; programmatic differences; application; enrollment; completion of coursework; records and transcripts; the provision of services; athletic and other eligibility; and State grants. Makes conforming changes.
Title
COM COL-OUT OF DIST-TUITION
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] |
Rep. Sharon Chung [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0159 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2023-02-28 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 6-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 6-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |