IL HB2515 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "gross combination weight rating" (GCWR). Provides that the GCWR of the power unit will not be used to define a commercial motor vehicle when the power unit is not towing another vehicle. Makes conforming changes regarding the definition of GCWR. Provides for the collection of a $10 surcharge for vehicles in the 12,000 lbs. and less flat weight plate category to identify those vehicles as covered farm vehicles. Makes it a serious traffic violation to drive a commercial motor vehicle on a highway with a commercial driver instruction permit, but unaccompanied by the holder of a valid commercial driver's license. Exempts persons operating a covered farm vehicle, as defined under the Illinois Vehicle Code, from requirement to have a commercial driver's license or requirement to submit a medical examiner's certificate for operation of a commercial motor vehicle in non-excepted interstate commerce. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
VEH CD-FARM VEH GCWR
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. John Anthony [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0057 |
2015-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-124.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-818 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-508.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |