IL HB2550 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in addition to other purposes, moneys in the Illinois Fire Fighters' Memorial Fund shall be used to provide scholarships for graduate study, undergraduate study, or any other post-secondary education approved by the Illinois Firefighter Memorial Foundation (rather than only graduate study or undergraduate study) to children and spouses of fire fighters killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-FIRE FIGHTER FUND-EDU
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0480 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date September 8, 2017 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-24 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-24 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-634 | Amended Code | Citation Text |