IL HB2609 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code to create the Office of School Safety within the State Board of Education. Provides for the Office's duties. Requires the Office to create a grant program for expenditures related to improving school safety. Provides that grant funds must be used for school security improvements, including training and safety-related upgrades to school buildings, equipment (including metal detectors and x-ray machines), and facilities. Specifies the grant application requirements. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-OFFICE OF SCH SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-08 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-01 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |