IL HB2620 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes the minimum petition signature requirement for a new State political party the same as that for a State office candidate of an established political party (now, the lesser of 25,000 or 1% of the number of voters voting in the most recent general election). Makes the minimum petition signature requirement for a new local political party the same as that for an established party candidate for the local office on the slate with the highest petition signature requirement (now, 5% of the number of voters in the relevant district or political subdivision who voted in the most recent election when district or subdivision officers were elected by the district or subdivision as a unit).
Title
ELECTIONS-NEW PARTY PETITIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-003-000 | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-002-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2620&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2620.htm |