IL HB2698 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Build Illinois Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may also make loans or equity investments to small businesses with moneys in the State Small Business Credit Initiative Fund (currently, the Department make only make such loans and equity investments with moneys in the Build Illinois Bond Fund, the Illinois Capital Revolving Fund, or the Illinois Equity Revolving Fund). Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may make loans to small businesses of up to $2,000,000 (currently, $750,000) per project. Provides that moneys collected from the fees imposed under this Act connected with the Capital Fund shall be deposited into the Capital Fund. Provides that loans under the minority, veteran, female, and persons with a disability loan program shall not exceed $400,000 (currently, $100,000) without a waiver from the Director of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Effective immediately.
Title
SMALL BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0377 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2017-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-04-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 750 | 9-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 750 | 9-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 750 | 9-4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 750 | 9-4.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |