IL HB2721 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to extend the repeal of the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters Act of 1984 from January 1, 2014 to January 1, 2024. Amends the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters Act of 1984. Adds Section headings and changes references of "Director" to "Secretary". Makes changes to the provisions concerning uncertified practice, violations, and civil penalties; definitions; restricted certificates; the administration of Act; the Certified Shorthand Reporters Board; the Department's authorization of examinations; expiration, renewal, and military service; endorsement and licensure without examination; fees and returned checks; advertising; grounds for disciplinary action; injunctive actions and orders to cease and desist; investigations and notice and hearing; records of proceedings; subpoenas and oaths; compelling testimony and contempt; the Board's report; hearing officers, reports, and review; order or certified copy and prima facie proof; restoration of license from discipline; suspension; certification of court records and the filing of receipt; penalties; continuing education; home rule; a licensee's responsibility to preserve his or her shorthand notes; and the Administrative Procedure Act. Adds provisions concerning social security numbers on license applications and confidentiality. Repeals a provision concerning practicing in this State or holding oneself out as being able to practice shorthand reporting. Makes other changes. Effective December 31, 2013.
Title
IDFPR-SHORTHAND REPORTERS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0445 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date December 31, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |