IL HB2721 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act and the Condominium Property Act. Provides that in the event of any resale of a unit by a member or unit owner other than the developer, the board of directors or managers shall make available for inspection to the prospective purchaser, among other things, a copy of the most recent independent professional reserve study obtained by the association for the property or a statement that the association has not obtained such a study within the last 7 years.
Title
CONDO/HOA-RESALE-RESERVE STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-27 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 22.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |