IL HB2766 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Municipal Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an annuitant formerly employed by the City of Chicago may authorize the withholding of a portion of his or her annuity for payment of dues to a labor organization (instead of the labor organization that formerly represented the annuitant when the annuitant was an active employee). Provides that at the request and at the expense of the labor organization (instead of the labor organization that formerly represented the annuitant when the annuitant was an active employee), the City of Chicago shall coordinate mailings no more than twice in any 12-month period to such annuitants and the Board shall supply current annuitant addresses to the City of Chicago upon request.
Title
PEN CD-CHI MUNI-WITHHOLDINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0601 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 8-244.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |