IL HB2806 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Volunteer Board Member Removal Act. Provides that the person or entity that appointed a member of a volunteer board or commission may remove that member for misconduct, official misconduct, or neglect of office. Provides that removal under the Act is in addition to any other method of removal provided by law. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL VOLUNTEER BOARD MEMBERS
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0602 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |