IL HB2816 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that "public body" includes road districts and any combination of public bodies under an intergovernmental agreement that includes provisions for a governing body of the agency created by the agreement. Defines "Freedom of Information officer" as an employee or official of a public body who is appointed by the public body and responsible for responding to all requests for information received by the public body. Provides that the Department of State Police shall furnish to a requester: (1) all information contained in the Law Enforcement Agencies Data System about the requester; and (2) every instance the name or vehicle registration information of the requester was queried and the name of the person making the inquiry. Provides that the information provided to a requester shall include all information contained in the Law Enforcement Agencies Data System relating to the requester, and is not limited to name and license plate information.
Title
FOIA-DEFINITIONS, LEADS INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 2.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2816&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2816.htm |