IL HB2846 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Requires the imposition of a school facility occupation tax in a county if the electors of the county have approved a proposition for the tax. Provides that a school facility occupation tax imposed by approval of the electors may be reduced or discontinued if the electors have voted to reduce or discontinue the tax. Provides that the State will not limit or alter rights and powers so as to impair the rights and remedies of holders of bonds secured by proceeds of a school facility occupation tax. Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Removes a sentence providing that a backdoor referendum is not required for alternate bonds if the proceeds backing the alternate bonds are realized from revenues obtained from a school facility occupation tax. Amends the School Code. Provides that a referendum shall not be required if the purchase, construction, or building of a school building is paid from funds received from the County School Facility Occupation Tax Law or from the proceeds of bonds secured by revenues obtained from that Law. Effective immediately.
Title
CNTY CD-FACILITY OCCUPATION TX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 350 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |