IL HB2846 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Best Candidate for the Job Act. Provides that private and public employers shall properly consider for employment and licenses persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses. Prohibits discrimination against such persons unless there is a direct relationship between the offense and the specific license or employment sought. Establishes criteria for evaluating convictions. Exempts law enforcement agencies.
Title
BEST CANDIDATE FOR JOB ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 011-002-004 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |