IL HB2846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois Department of Transportation (currently, the Regional Transportation Authority) shall develop, adopt, and implement system safety program standards and procedures meeting the requirements of the federal Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act. Limits liability. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make certain records of the Illinois Department of Transportation exempt from inspection and copying. Amends the Bi-State Transit Safety Act. Provides a repeal date of December 31, 2017 for that Act. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Regional Transportation Authority shall comply with all safety requirements under specified federal law as required by the Department of Transportation. Provides that the Department of Transportation has rail transit safety oversight authority for MetroLink. Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RTA-IDOT-FAST ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 2705-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 111 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 9b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |