IL HB2955 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that within 30 days of its enactment into law, the Governor's Office of Management and Budget shall publish to its website the budget of the State of Illinois for the coming fiscal year in its entirety in specified formats.
Title
ONLINE BUDGET PUBLICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0461 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |