IL HB2968 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and the Social Work Examining and Disciplinary Board shall not request, inquire into, or consider certain criminal history records in connection with an application for licensure. Provides that a period of 5 years after a conviction of any felony or of a misdemeanor directly related to the practice of the profession, or 3 years since release from confinement, is prima facie evidence of rehabilitation. Requires the Department to consider certain mitigating factors and evidence of rehabilitation for applicants for licensure. Requires the Department, upon denial of a license, to provide the applicants certain information concerning the denial. Requires the Department to issue an annual report on certain information concerning granting or denial of license applications. Provides that the Department may refuse to issue or renew a license or may suspend, revoke, or place on probation or take other action on a license for certain criminal history for current licensees. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
SOCIAL WORK-CONVICTION HISTORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 20 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 9A-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |