IL HB2972 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rescue Squad Districts Act. Provides that a rescue squad district may fix, charge, and collect fees for rescue squad services and ambulance services within or outside of the rescue squad district not exceeding the reasonable cost of the service. Effective immediately.
Title
RESCUE SQUAD DISTRICTS-FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0174 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2005 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |