IL HB2974 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that, on and after July 1, 2023, marine fuel is exempt from the tax imposed under the Act. Provides that "marine fuel" means motor fuel specially formulated to be used in the propulsion of watercraft. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-MARINE FUEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 1.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2974&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2974.htm |