IL HB2998 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Directs the Department of Public Health to study current and potential uses of electronic monitoring and recording for the purpose of preventing and identifying abuse and neglect within assisted living establishments. Requires the Department to report its findings to the General Assembly and Governor. Provides that, if the Department determines, after conducting its study, that the benefits of monitoring within assisted living establishments outweigh the costs of that monitoring, then the Department may adopt rules requiring the installation and use of electronic monitoring and recording within assisted living establishments.
Title
ASSISTED LIVING-MONITORING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-03-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |