IL HB3008 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that for fiscal years 2022, 2023, and 2024 only, the Department shall adopt rules that allow the Department to provide no more than 50% of the total funding awarded to qualified and selected applicants at the time an executed grant agreement is in place for specified grant programs established under the Code and any other such programs funded through the Rebuild Illinois Capital Program or other public infrastructure programs administered by the Department. Provides that the rules shall establish a process in which the Department may recoup costs if the entity receiving the grant does not satisfy the requirements necessary to receive full funding for the approved grant project. Repeals the provision on July 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-GRANT FUNDING RULES
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3008&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3008.htm |