IL HB3055 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes certain changes to the incremental annual energy savings goals that electric utilities must meet by implementing cost-effective energy efficiency measures. Provides that the amount of energy efficiency and demand-response measures implemented for any single year shall be reduced by an amount necessary to limit the estimated average net increase due to the cost of these measures included in the amounts paid by eligible retail customers in connection with electric service to no more than the greater of 2.015% of the amount paid per kilowatthour by those customers during the year ending May 31, 2007 or the incremental amount per kilowatthour paid for these measures in 2011, unless the Commission concludes during a plan filing proceeding that the limitation would result in the utility foregoing cost-effective opportunities for savings that would otherwise create net aggregate bill reductions for its customers. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES - ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-05-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 023-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-04-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-03-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |