IL HB3120 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that all contact tracing information shall be kept confidential by any contact tracer and may not be disclosed except as necessary to carry out contact tracing or a permitted purpose. Provides that an individual may waive the confidentiality provided for by this Section only by a written, informed, and voluntary waiver, in plain language and in a language understandable to the individual making the waiver, and not part of any other document. Provides that a disclosure of contact tracing information shall be limited in scope as to the identity of any individual, the information to be disclosed, and the party to which disclosure may be made, and shall not authorize re-disclosure except as explicitly authorized by the terms of the waiver. Provides that the provisions do not bar otherwise lawful disclosure, possession, or use of contact tracing information, including aggregate contact tracing information, that is de-identified. Requires disclosure, possession, or use under the provisions to only be for a public health or public health research purpose. Provides that no contact tracer may provide contact tracing information to a law enforcement agent or entity or immigration authority. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt specified rules. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
COVID-19 CONTACT TRACING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3120&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3120.htm |