IL HB3152 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that any vehicle purchased with State funds shall be a vehicle fueled by electricity or electricity and gasohol, including hybrid vehicles or plug-in hybrid vehicles, when the cost is less than 10% more than a similar gasoline-fueled vehicle.
Title
PROCUREMENT-ELECTRIC VEHICLES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 25-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |